Financial history AREIVIM

Charity number: 1125655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £79.38k £71.47k £92.90k £107.07k £93.66k
Total expenditure £68.65k £66.09k £83.81k £103.59k £109.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A