FRIENDS OF NEW RIVER GREEN CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Charity number: 1124729
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and creating opportunities for children and families using the centre and living across the reach area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Total income: £420
Total expenditure: £105
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Islington
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 June 2008: Standard registration
- 18 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £420 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £105 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN, THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS IN ISLINGTON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ISLINGTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window