Accounts and annual returns FRIENDSHIP ZONE LIMITED

Charity number: 1124724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2022 30 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 30 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 01 March 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 01 March 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window