SHIVIA

Charity number: 1126444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Waring Trustee 19 December 2019 None on record
Sudeshna Mukherjee Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Christopher Langridge Trustee 31 January 2014 None on record
SHAILENDRA PATEL Trustee 20 March 2020
SOPHIA AKASH FOUNDATION CIO
Dr Yasmine Hilton Chair 05 May 2017 None on record
OLIVIA DONNELLY Trustee
MULTI AGENCY INTERNATIONAL TRAINING AND SUPPORT Received: On time
Narind Pratap Singh Trustee 10 January 2019 None on record
TIMOTHY NELSEN Trustee None on record