Financial history MONTGOMERY COMMUNITY BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1125054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.19k £279 £510 £1.10k £0
Total expenditure £184 £30 £0 £0 £61
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A