SUPPORTING DALIT CHILDREN

Charity number: 1125102
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 January 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 June 2017 On time Download