SUPPORTING DALIT CHILDREN

Charity number: 1125102
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £120.33k £120.49k £162.22k £159.05k £188.72k
Total expenditure £125.74k £120.52k £162.20k £159.06k £188.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A