Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (JUNIORS)

Charity number: 1126098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 July 2022 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 April 2021 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required