BLIND LIFE IN DURHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide social activities that include social meetings and accessible sports. Other activities include group days out, regular virtual meetings, technology support and mentoring. We also produce a monthly newsletter in various formats. All the venues we use are suitable for disabled access.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 07 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JAMES WELCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rhona Mary Cross | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR MICHAEL GANDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH GANDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET WELCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.54k | £17.84k | £41.04k | £19.43k | £10.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.78k | £18.34k | £25.37k | £27.41k | £24.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENTS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DURHAM AREA BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, AGENCIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND SAID PERSONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO BOTH ADVANCE EDUCATION INTO THE ISSUES FACING SUCH PERSONS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
DURHAM AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 BROOKSIDE AVENUE
CROOK
DL15 8LB
- Phone:
- 01388764528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window