DISCRIMINATION LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124892
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 February 2017 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 February 2017 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 February 2016 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 16 February 2016 16 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)