DISCRIMINATION LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1124892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £28.31k £26.11k £26.79k £28.26k £24.25k
Total expenditure £27.61k £28.75k £28.81k £25.22k £25.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A