SOUTH LONDON COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1125078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 18 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 18 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 12 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 23 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required