INTERCESSORS MINISTRIES OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1124574
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 08/05/2016 08/05/2017 08/05/2018 08/05/2019 08/05/2020
Total gross income £72.65k £25.15k £17.51k £31.75k £23.43k
Total expenditure £33.59k £35.74k £29.18k £31.05k £25.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A