FRIENDS OF BROOKE HILL ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1124401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.92k £3.38k £3.51k £4.82k £3.09k
Total expenditure £2.56k £4.41k £1.73k £1.73k £606
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A