Accounts and annual returns POWER AND MERCY OUTREACH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1125429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 January 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2018 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 December 2017 58 days late Download Open in new window