Financial history HAXBY CHRISTIAN CAFE LTD

Charity number: 1125569
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £151.76k £150.97k £155.95k £140.14k £122.82k
Total expenditure £147.72k £147.28k £158.99k £138.02k £109.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £52.39k £56.28k