ROTHER DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1124723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download