ROTHER DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1124723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £116.10k £91.14k £89.76k £113.97k £112.65k
Total expenditure £103.99k £99.51k £103.98k £126.95k £108.79k
Income from government contracts £85.00k £85.00k £85.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £85.00k £85.00k