Trustees TEMPO TIME CREDITS LIMITED

Charity number: 1135143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ron Jarman Chair 27 January 2021
WORLD AT PLAY
Received: On time
Christina Isabell Taylor Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Karen Jane Penney Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
John Puzey Trustee 27 January 2021
FRIENDS OF PONTARDAWE ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time
Kieran Jones Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
SIDDHI TRIVEDI Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Marc Guy Giraudon Trustee 13 January 2020
THRIVE SOCIAL HOUSING
Recently registered
Stuart Mullin Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
ADAM EDWARD STANLEY Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
NEAL HOUNSELL Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
Tom Ebbutt Trustee 13 October 2015
THE SOCIAL MARKET FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SUN BABIES' NURSERY
Received: On time