Accounts and annual returns SPELTHORNE YOUNG VOICES

Charity number: 1127726
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 101 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 101 days
Annual return 30 December 2020 22 November 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2019 06 April 2021 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2018 05 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017 Not Required