Financial history SPELTHORNE YOUNG VOICES

Charity number: 1127726
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2016 30/12/2017 30/12/2018 30/12/2019 30/12/2020
Total gross income £3.46k £5.46k £4.00k £4.00k £153
Total expenditure £4.20k £4.76k £5.11k £5.11k £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A