AFRICAN HEART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125276
Charity reporting is overdue by 846 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £10 £0
Total expenditure £523 £718 £105 £10 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0