CENTRAL BEDFORDSHIRE CANINE TRUST

Charity number: 1124683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 07 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required