Financial history THE ST. ENDELLION FESTIVALS TRUST

Charity number: 1124805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £206.05k £263.33k £201.22k £233.32k £80.52k
Total expenditure £169.46k £203.53k £182.17k £219.02k £90.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A