Trustees THE ST. ENDELLION FESTIVALS TRUST

Charity number: 1124805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LADY TESSA SUZANNE MARY BREWER Chair 08 July 2018
ST. JOHN'S, SMITH SQUARE CHARITABLE TRUST
THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE AID IN SICKNESS TRUST
Received: On time
PHILIP TIZZARD Trustee 16 May 2021
ST TUDY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
IAN DAVID SANDBROOK Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
ANGUS JOHN MERYON Trustee 03 April 2015
None on record
ROBERT SLOMAN Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
Diane Hume Trustee 07 June 2013
THE STOUR FESTIVAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
YASHA MORGENSTERN Trustee 07 June 2013
None on record
MARK PADMORE Trustee 27 March 2012
None on record
MARTIN JAMES PAUL COOKE MBE Trustee
CHESTER FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: On time
FRANCES INA HICKOX Trustee
None on record