FRIENDS OF AINTHORPE

Charity number: 1124886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.51k £2.29k £1.51k £1.20k £1.20k
Total expenditure £1.54k £1.79k £3.38k £1.53k £1.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A