THORNFORD SCHOOL MEALS CLUB LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide hot, nutritious, affordable lunches to pupils at Thornford, Bradford Abbas and Yetminster Primary Schools and employ staff to cook them. We also supply outmeals to villagers and a lunch club both supported by volunteers. Any profit we make is used for educational purposes such as contributions to improve school facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
- 30 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.46k | £26.68k | £36.60k | £74.15k | £115.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.92k | £27.76k | £29.35k | £64.02k | £64.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 June 2017 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
26 June 2017 | 146 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THORNFORD C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL AND OTHER SCHOOLS IN THE SURROUNDING AREA AS APPROPRIATE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOOL MEALS MADE WITH NUTRITIOUS FOOD, AND INFORMATION ABOUT NUTRITIONAL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
THORNFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window