KEEN LONDON

Charity number: 1124915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £91.65k £123.30k £146.71k £196.49k £248.69k
Total expenditure £112.34k £123.40k £127.62k £169.80k £200.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A