SCOTT BOLTON TRUST

Charity number: 1125000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20.96k £22.12k £20.49k £25.16k £23.13k
Total expenditure £28.82k £33.52k £32.77k £39.18k £41.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A