Financial history PENNY APPEAL

Charity number: 1128341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.55m £33.15m £31.50m £28.68m £16.19m
Total expenditure £24.50m £35.12m £30.91m £23.29m £17.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200.00k £130.42k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £24.53m £33.13m £31.49m £26.03m £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £16.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.89k £26.17k £14.07k £30.57k £19.07k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.62m £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.55m £26.74m £25.13m £19.99m £13.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.95m £8.38m £5.20m £3.29m £4.04m
Expenditure - Governance £121.01k £173.06k £255.86k £271.72k £225.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.54m £12.80m £12.49m £12.26m £7.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £576.61k £0 £0