THE NUCLEAR INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1125404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 November 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 November 2017 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time Download