Trustees THE NUCLEAR INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1125404

Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Elizabeth Rayment OBE | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hedger CSci MNucI | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Deakin FNucI | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Wynn Davies | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|||||
GARETH DAVIES | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Ruth Nugent | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jasbir Sidhu | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Salisbury FNucI | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Parry-Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA O'KEEFFE | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.