HILLINGDON REFUGEE SUPPORT ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1125656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £111.43k £114.21k £119.43k £118.64k £58.01k
Total expenditure £101.54k £105.48k £103.37k £102.70k £87.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A