HILLINGDON REFUGEE SUPPORT ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1125656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV DANIEL OTIENO-NDALE Chair 12 March 2005 None on record
Chukwuma Fidel Nkwodinmah Trustee 08 August 2015 None on record
GINA LOUISE CONNOLLY Trustee 17 August 2020 None on record
Mildred Ruth Akullo Atubo Ogwal Trustee 02 February 2020 None on record
Joan Hutchby Trustee 01 December 2008 None on record
ABIGALE TESSEMA Trustee 25 August 2020 None on record