Accounts and annual returns 1610 LIMITED

Charity number: 1130010
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 February 2022 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 22 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window