Financial history 1610 LIMITED

Charity number: 1130010
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.51m £11.76m £6.37m £2.84m £3.50m
Total expenditure £7.52m £10.01m £6.51m £2.73m £3.73m
Income from government contracts £1.37m £2.12m £977.56k £263.60k £495.05k
Income from government grants £15.84k £2.11m N/A £165.00k £1.46m
Income - Donations and legacies £19.05k £284.10k £23.61k £169.76k £319.22k
Income - Other trading activities £231.61k £315.37k £179.98k £86.71k £13.02k
Income - Charitable activities £7.26m £11.16m £6.16m £2.58m £2.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.57k £866 £2.21k £548 £144
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.15m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.40m £9.82m £6.41m £2.68m £3.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £128.68k £193.78k £98.71k £50.48k £16.73k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.00k £81.09k £31.21k £34.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0