Financial history THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION WEST SOMERSET BRANCH

Charity number: 1124882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.05k £2.52k £1.28k £5.29k £5
Total expenditure £5.95k £7.43k £3.00k £5.55k £1.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A