HANNAH MEMORIAL ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1125447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 15/02/2016 15/02/2017 15/02/2018 15/02/2019 15/02/2020
Total gross income £13.52k £9.96k £14.79k £18.92k £10.40k
Total expenditure £8.82k £12.11k £18.40k £15.32k £16.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A