Trustees SYLVA FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1128516

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE TAYLOR | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Dr MARY MARGARET BARKHAM | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
James Waterson MICFor | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr James Ivo Lindsay Morison | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Buxton MBE | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
LUKE HUGHES | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||
LUCIUS CARY OBE | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.