SHELTER FROM THE STORM

Charity number: 1125575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £229.14k £371.86k £376.33k £794.95k £627.19k
Total expenditure £250.04k £263.66k £342.69k £366.97k £337.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £793.60k £624.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.58k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.36k £1.00k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £365.44k £336.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.53k £1.16k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.88k £15.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0