Financial history NWG NETWORK

Charity number: 1125632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £769.63k £801.60k £556.06k £707.85k £573.25k
Total expenditure £766.09k £692.98k £806.54k £578.88k £670.02k
Income from government contracts £491.25k £315.93k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £197.37k £272.96k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.61k £5.70k £16.43k £2.47k £464.30k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £1.48k £0
Income - Charitable activities £138.91k £795.63k £539.01k £644.11k £108.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £61 £262 £622 £0 £51
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £49.40k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.71k £671.24k £765.80k £560.34k £653.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.38k £21.74k £40.74k £18.53k £16.32k
Expenditure - Governance £9.21k £10.04k £10.01k £0 £8.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0