BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1127412
Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 303 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 March 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 February 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required