THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION EAST ANGLIA BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Branch provides Support and Camaraderie for Ex Servicemen from the Parachute Regiment and Ex Airborne forces. The Branch provides a forum for serving and ex serving members of the Parachute Regiment. Members of the Branch provide an attendance at Memorial Events and Services relevant to the interests of the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Curt Vines | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Kirrage | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.19k | £1.13k | £1.94k | £1.74k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22k | £50 | £5.61k | £2.44k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND STANDARD BRANCH RULES APPROVED ON 26 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
PLEASE REFER TO THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 214015)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Appartment 16 Berechurch Hall
Berechurch Hall Road
Colchester
Essex
CO2 9NW
- Phone:
- 01206765386
- Email:
- skirrage@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window