THE NATIONAL SKILLS ACADEMY FOR SPORT AND ACTIVE LEISURE

Charity number: 1127431
Charity reporting is overdue by 992 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 261 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 June 2021 149 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 627 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 627 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 992 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 992 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 December 2016 On time Download