EUROPA NOSTRA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support Europa Nostra, its 'Parent Body', in its objectives and to promote awareness of, access to and enjoyment of European heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 December 2008: Standard registration
- 25 August 2023: Funds received from 291690 EUROPA NOSTRA LONDON
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Jadwiga Karmowska | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mather Collins | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Benjamin Guy Hervey-Bathurst | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Dunn | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Helen Shelley | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ovenstone | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Johnston Crofts | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WAINWRIGHT THOMSON | Trustee | 07 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £0 | £2.56k | £163 | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | £261 | £496 | £1.13k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF, AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND IN OR TOWARDS: (A) PROMOTING AND FOSTERING IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IN EUROPE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: I. THE CONSERVATION OF THE EUROPEAN CULTURAL AND NATURAL HERITAGE II. HIGH STANDARDS OF CONTEMPORARY ARCHITECTURE AND PLANNING III. THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN TOWN AND COUNTRY (B) THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS,
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Victoria Road
CHESHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP5 3AJ
- Phone:
- 07817 091791
- Email:
- europanostrauk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window