WOMBLETON SPORTS AND RECREATION CLUB

Charity number: 1126022
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 September 2020 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 September 2020 443 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 April 2018 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required