OXFORD UNITED IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1125173
Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/09/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £632.47k £458.99k £254.40k £333.01k £273.29k
Total expenditure £271.45k £564.80k £281.11k £308.31k £326.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £380.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £252.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £248.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £16.67k N/A N/A N/A N/A