Trustees OXFORD UNITED IN THE COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1125173

Charity reporting is overdue by 336 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy David Faulkner | Chair | 05 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Zaki Mohammed Nuseibeh | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mathew David Everett | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Parker | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart James Bradney | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Greig Antony Box Turnbull | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN DONALD HUDSPETH | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.