WORLD MUSCLE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of WMS are open to all professionals working in the neuromuscular field. It is a multidisciplinary Society reflecting in particular the different disciplines involved in the study of neuromuscular disorders and the management of patients with these disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Teresinha Evangelista | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Dr. Benedikt Schoser | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alan Beggs | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jordi Diaz-Manera | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
A/ Professor Gianina Ravenscroft | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Alfano | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Dowling | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Laurent Servais | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Werner Stenzel | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR John Vissing | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR Francesco Muntoni | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr GISELE BONNE | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR VOLKER STRAUB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ICHIZO NISHINO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR KEVIN FLANIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.31k | £124.01k | £515.12k | £579.07k | £140.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.66k | £128.28k | £117.35k | £192.22k | £388.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £359.63k | £459.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £155.49k | £119.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £117.35k | £192.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £2.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF NEUROMUSCULAR DISORDERS. 2 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NEUROMUSCULAR DISORDERS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. ON PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD CIDER PRESS
5 The Quay
Tuckenhay
TOTNES
TQ9 7EQ
- Phone:
- 07584 176583
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.