ONSIDE YOUTH ZONES

Charity number: 1125893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.65m £3.51m £3.63m £6.54m £5.40m
Total expenditure £3.58m £3.64m £3.65m £6.04m £5.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £445.99k £31.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £531.62k £1.70m £1.55m £3.11m £3.10m
Income - Other trading activities £1.28m £155.05k £160.29k £975.15k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.66m £1.92m £2.45m £2.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.51k £2.05k £1.06k £3.84k £6.73k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £42.18k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.21m £3.59m £3.62m £5.47m £5.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £371.25k £49.36k £30.04k £571.86k £43.08k
Expenditure - Governance £6.17k £5.92k £6.90k £10.73k £8.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0